KY SB115 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - to Judiciary (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.1412 to require that persons who traffic in heroin or fentanyl be charged as Class C felons for the first offense.
Title
AN ACT relating to trafficking in heroin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-02-25 | House | received in House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-6 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2016 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-18 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-25 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |