KY SB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate $23,354,400 in fiscal year 2016-2017 and $125,000,000 in fiscal year 2017-2018 from the Kentucky permanent pension fund to the Kentucky Retirement Systems and apply the appropriation to the unfunded liability of the State Police Retirement System pension fund; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to funding for the State Police Retirement System, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | received in House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |