KY SB11 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.560 to require smoking cessation programs or treatment interventions for pregnant smokers to be in accordance with protocols and guidelines recommended by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention.
Title
AN ACT relating to smoking cessation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-03-10 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-10 | taken from committee | |
2010-01-06 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate | |
2010-09-02 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Health and Welfare |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB11.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB11/bill.doc |