KY SB108 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.211 to update the definition of health care coverage as it relates to child support enforcement procedures to comply with changes in federal law.
Title
AN ACT relating to child support enforcement of health care coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 415 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 480 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 480 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2018-03-20 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-20 | House | 1st reading |
2018-03-20 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-01 | House | received in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB108.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB108/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB108/vote_history.pdf |