KY SB108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 018)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 018)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend some sections of KRS Chapter 407 and create other sections to adopt, with some variation, the 2008 amendments to the language of the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act, published by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws to reflect the Hague Convention on the International Recovery of Child Support and Other Forms of Family Maintenance; include language to update Articles 1 to 6 of KRS Chapter 407 regarding jurisdiction and the establishment, enforcement, and modification of support orders; expand Article 7 of KRS Chapter 407 to establish procedures under the Convention; amend Articles 8 and 9 of KRS Chapter 407 and KRS 403.135 to conform; repeal KRS 407.59015.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 018) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2015-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-03 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2015-03-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-02-27 | House | received in House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 26, 2015 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-05 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-02-05 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |