KY SB105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Members appointed to pending conference committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Members appointed to pending conference committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 257.010 to define "Commission"; create new sections of KRS Chapter 257 to create the Kentucky Livestock Care Standards Commission; to name the members of the commission; to establish the terms of the members; to prohibit the commission from abrogating the regulatory authority of the Kentucky Horse Racing Authority or the Kentucky Board of Veterinary Examiners; to prohibit local governments from having livestock or poultry standards that exceed the standards of the commission.
Title
AN ACT relating to agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Members appointed to pending conference committee | |
2010-03-29 | received in House | |
2010-03-29 | Members appointed to pending conference committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) | |
2010-03-24 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-24 | 3rd reading, passed 89-8 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) | |
2010-03-19 | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (5-title) filed | |
2010-03-19 | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn | |
2010-03-18 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-18 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-17 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-15 | returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2010-03-15 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-15 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-05 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-17 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2010-02-12 | received in House | |
2010-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-09 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2010 | |
2010-02-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-27 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2010-01-26 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB105.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB105/bill.doc |