KY SB102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 64)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 64)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 507.010 to define "abuse"; amend KRS 507.030 to include the death of a person caused by intentional abuse as a possible element of manslaughter in the first degree.
Title
AN ACT relating to criminal homicide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 64) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-09 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-09 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | received in House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-05 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |