KY SB10 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 216B.0425 to define the terms "acute stroke ready hospital certification" and "comprehensive stroke center certification"; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to maintain a list of acute stroke ready hospitals, comprehensive stroke centers, and primary stroke centers, post the list on its Web site, and provide the list to the Kentucky Board of Emergency Medical Services; require the board to provide the list to local emergency medical services providers; amend KRS 311A.180 to require emergency medical services directors to establish pre-hospital care protocols for the assessment, treatment, and transport of stroke patients; and amend other statutes to correct references to the Joint Commission.
Title
AN ACT relating to strokes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 9) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-10 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-09 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-06 | House | received in House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 5, 2015 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-02-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB10.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB10/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB10/vote_history.pdf |