KY SB10 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - posted in committee
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - posted in committee
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Propose to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky adopting a 21st Century Bill of Rights; claim sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States; establish that no law or rule shall compel certain persons to participate in health care systems or to provide abortion services; prohibit laws that prevent the severing of coal, that restrict posting of the Ten Commandments, that restrict hunting and fishing, or that infringe upon the lawful possession or use of firearms or ammunition; prohibit expansion of gambling unless it is permitted by a constitutional amendment; establish that governmental agencies should promote the use of Kentucky coal and make public information available on the Internet, and that the General Assembly should provide a reasonable period of time for public review and comment on any appropriation or revenue measure.
Title
AN ACT proposing to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky, adopting a 21st Century Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Sen. John Schickel [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Jack Westwood [R] | Sen. David Williams [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-04 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2011-02-02 | received in House | |
2011-01-07 | 3rd reading, passed 26-12 | |
2011-01-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 7, 2011 | |
2011-01-07 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2011-01-05 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-05 | 2nd reading | |
2011-01-05 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-04 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-04 | 1st reading | |
2011-01-04 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB10.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB10/bill.doc |