KY SB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-01-09 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 39A.090 to limit the effective dates of executive orders issued by the Governor to 30 days unless an extension is approved by the General Assembly, and prohibit the Governor from issuing a new executive order relating to the same emergency without the approval of the General Assembly; amend KRS 39A.100 to allow an executive order relating to elections to remain in effect regardless of the time limitations in KRS 39A.090; amend KRS 39A.180 to limit administrative regulations promulgated under KRS 39A.180 to 30 days unless an extension is approved by the General Assembly; amend KRS 214.020 to limit administrative regulations promulgated under KRS 214.020 to 30 days unless an extension is approved by the General Assembly; amend KRS 241.090 to limit the emergency jurisdiction and peace officer status of administrators and investigators under the alcohol beverage control board to the limitations in KRS 39A.090; amend KRS 315.500 to prevent the time limitations of KRS 39A.090 from affecting the emergency distribution of pharmaceuticals; amend KRS 39A.374 to prevent the time limitations of KRS 39A.090 from affecting the limitations on increased prices during an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to emergencies and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/hfa1 hfa 4 FINAL PASSAGE RSN# 1508 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 19 (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 sca 1T RSN# 1502 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-09Senatedelivered to Governor
2021-01-09Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-01-09Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-01-09Senatepassed 26-5
2021-01-09SenateSenate concurred in House floor amendments (1) and (4)
2021-01-09Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1) and (4)
2021-01-09Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-09House3rd reading, passed 75-21 with floor amendments (1) and (4)
2021-01-09Housefloor amendment (5) withdrawn
2021-01-08Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) and (3) and (4) and (5) filed
2021-01-08Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for January 9, 2021
2021-01-08Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-01-07Houseposted in committee
2021-01-07Houseto State Government (H)
2021-01-07House1st reading
2021-01-07Housetaken from Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-07Housereceived in House
2021-01-07Senate3rd reading, passed 27-9-1 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-01-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021
2021-01-06Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-01-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2021-01-05Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-05Senate1st reading
2021-01-05Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-05Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-01-05Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate
2020-08-06SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback