KY SB1 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - to Education (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 156.557 to require schools districts to develop and implement a professional growth and effectiveness system based on a statewide framework; prohibit the Kentucky Department of Education from imposing reporting requirements related to the system on local districts; prohibit the system from using student growth data in the system; require the local school board to adopt guidelines for its superintendent to use in implementing the system; require evaluations annually for teachers who have not attained continuing service status and every three years for teachers with continuing service status, principals, and assistant principals; and prohibit evaluation results from being included in school accountability; amend KRS 156.160 to allow a foreign language course, career and technical education course, or a computer technology or programming course to meet the arts and humanities requirement for high school graduation; amend KRS 158.305 to require the Department of Education to provide assistance in implementing a response-to-intervention system if requested by a local district; amend KRS 158.645 to expand sufficient grounding in the arts to include specific coursework application experience; amend KRS 158.6453 to implement a process for reviewing academic standards and assessments; require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate regulations for the administration of the process; delete program reviews and audits from the statewide assessment system; delete social studies from the statewide assessment requirements; require a college admissions and placement exam to be given in the fall of grade nine and require the Kentucky Department of Education to pay for it; prohibit norm-referenced exams from being used as a measure of academic growth; and delete provisions regarding WorkKeys assessments; amend KRS 158.6455 to delete program reviews and college admissions and placement exams from the accountability system; require school improvement results to look at growth over three years as compared to similar schools; include progress toward English proficiency, quality of school climate and safety, high school graduation rates, and postsecondary readiness in the accountability system; require the Kentucky Community and Technical College System to annually compile a list of industry-recognized certifications; require the Kentucky Department of Education to pay for the cost of initial assessments taken to achieve industry-recognized certifications; prohibit scores of certain exceptional children or youth from being included in a school's accountability scores; and amend the criteria for schools and districts receiving consequences and assistance under regulations promulgated by the Kentucky Board of Education; amend KRS 158.649 to requires schools to set achievement gap targets every three years and require reporting to the commissioner of education when gap reductions do not occur in three years; amend KRS 158.782 to change the criteria for the Kentucky Board of Education providing highly skilled education assistance to schools and districts; amend KRS 158.805 to allow Commonwealth school improvement funds to be used for personnel costs; amend KRS 158.840 to prohibit the Kentucky Department of Education from requiring intervention reporting except in certain circumstances; amend KRS 160.345 to delete language regarding principal replacement; amend KRS 160.346 to add definitions for focus school, initial intervention school, and priority school and add provisions for each; define and describe a turnaround audit and intervention process for priority schools; delete provisions pertaining to current school audit process; delete the current intervention options approved by the Kentucky Board of Education; require schools that meet certain criteria to participate in an intervention option approved by the Kentucky Board of Education; require schools that are not successful under the current audit and intervention process to implement the turnaround audit and intervention process; and allow a district that has success with the turnaround intervention process to implement it in other priority schools; amend KRS 158.6458, 158.6459, 160.107, and 164.7874 to conform; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public education and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22Houseto Education (H)
2016-02-18Housereceived in House
2016-02-17Senatepassed 25-12 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (2)
2016-02-17Senatefloor amendments (1) and (4-title) withdrawn
2016-02-17Senatefloor amendment (3) defeated
2016-02-17Senate3rd reading
2016-02-16Senatefloor amendment (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4-title) filed
2016-02-16Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 17, 2016
2016-02-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-11Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2016-02-11Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-01-07Senateto Education (S)
2016-01-06Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback