KY HR69 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the Federal Aviation Administration to update its administrative regulations pertaining to agricultural unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging the Federal Aviation Administration to update its administrative regulations pertaining to agricultural unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | to House Floor |
2022-02-24 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Aeronautics and Aviation
Agriculture
Science and Technology
Technology
Aeronautics and Aviation
Agriculture
Science and Technology
Technology
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hr69.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hr69/orig_bill.pdf |