KY HR59 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Affirm support for services and providers addressing the domestic violence, sexual violence, and child abuse public health crisis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION affirming support for services and providers addressing the domestic violence, sexual violence, and child abuse public health crisis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29Houseadopted by voice vote
2021-03-15Houseto House Floor
2021-03-15Housetaken from Rules
2021-03-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-03-04Houseposted in committee
2021-03-04Houseto Health & Family Services (H)
2021-02-10Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback