KY HR52 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Honor Kentucky Association of Highway Contractors upon its 100th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION honoring the Kentucky Association of Highway Contractors upon its 100th anniversary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11Houseadopted by voice vote
2021-03-04Houseto House Floor
2021-03-03House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-03-02Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-26Houseposted in committee
2021-02-24Houseto Transportation (H)
2021-02-04Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-02-04Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback