KY HR35 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize June 2022 as National Dairy Month.
Title
A RESOLUTION recognizing June 2022 as National Dairy Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | adopted by voice vote |
2022-02-10 | House | to House Floor |
2022-02-10 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2022-01-12 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-12 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hr35.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hr35/orig_bill.pdf |