KY HR235 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - 3rd reading, adopted 96-1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - 3rd reading, adopted 96-1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Request the Agriculture Committee examine agricultural fencing laws and consider possible changes to assist individuals with small acreage and no livestock.
Title
Request the Agriculture Committee examine agricultural fencing laws and consider possible changes to assist individuals with small acreage and no livestock.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 96-1 |
2016-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | posting waived |
2016-03-14 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2016-03-11 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HR235.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HR235/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HR235/vote_history.pdf |