KY HR175 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 with Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 with Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Honor the memory of Dr. Norman E. Borlaug on the 100th anniversary of his birth, and stress the importance of genetically modified crops in combating world hunger.
Title
Honor the memory of Dr. Norman E. Borlaug on the 100th anniversary of his birth, and stress the importance of genetically modified crops in combating world hunger.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-17 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | to House Floor |
2014-02-28 | House | introduced in House |