KY HR106 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution encouraging local boards of education to solicit private support to provide bleeding control kits and training.
Title
A RESOLUTION encouraging local boards of education to solicit private support to provide for bleeding control kits and training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-09 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-28 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2020-02-27 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-27 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hr106.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hr106/orig_bill.pdf |