KY HR105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - 3rd reading, adopted 96-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Urge the United States Congress to enact legislation granting the United States Department of Agriculture jurisdiction over labeling requirements for imitation meat products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION urging Congress to enact legislation granting the United States Department of Agriculture jurisdiction over labeling requirements for imitation meat products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 176 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28House3rd reading, adopted 96-1
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Houseto Agriculture (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback