KY HJR77 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Urging the Department of Defense and the United States Army to reconsider proposed cuts to Fort Knox and Fort Campbell.
Title
Urging the Department of Defense and the United States Army to reconsider proposed cuts to Fort Knox and Fort Campbell.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 95-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HJ77.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HJ77/bill.doc |
Amendment | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HJ77/HCS1.doc |