KY HJR48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Direct the Office of the Secretary of State to conduct a study of civic education and engagement; require a report to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2014.
Title
Direct the Office of the Secretary of State to conduct a study of civic education and engagement; require a report to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 |
2014-01-29 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-01-29 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-22 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-16 | House | to Education (H) |
2014-01-15 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ48.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ48/bill.doc |