KY HCR59 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Designate April 6, 2017, as the World War One Centennial Day throughout the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Title
Designate April 6, 2017, as the World War One Centennial Day throughout the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 26) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | received in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 |
2017-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-15 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2017-02-10 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HCR59.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HC59/bill.pdf |