KY HCR42 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create the Task Force on Children Exposed to and Affected by Domestic Violence; require the task force to assess state and local response and services to children exposed to domestic violence; study strategies to identify children; study initiatives to reduce the negative effects on children; state the objectives of the task force; state the desired outcomes of the task force; establish membership of the task force; require monthly meetings during the 2011 interim; require a report to be submitted to LRC by December 31, 2011.
Title
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create the Task Force on Children Exposed to and Affected by Domestic Violence; require the task force to assess state and local response and services to children exposed to domestic violence; study strategies to identify children; study initiatives to reduce the negative effects on children; state the objectives of the task force; state the desired outcomes of the task force; establish membership of the task force; require monthly meetings during the 2011 interim; require a report to be submitted to LRC by December 31, 2011.
Sponsors
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-02-16 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | taken from the Consent Calendar and placed on Regular Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC42.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC42/bill.doc |