KY HCR40 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Kentucky's Congressional delegation to include Kentucky's Veterans Affairs Medical Centers into the Center for Compassionate Innovation, a U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs pilot program enabling the use of hyperbaric oxygen treatment for veterans with a traumatic brain injury or post-traumatic stress disorder.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging Kentucky's Congressional delegation to include Kentucky's Veterans Affairs Medical Centers into the Center for Compassionate Innovation, a U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs pilot program enabling the use of hyperbaric oxygen therapy treatment for veterans with a traumatic brain injury or post-traumatic stress disorder.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Angie Hatton [D] |
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2213 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 76 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 76 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 60) |
2022-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-01 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 97-0 |
2022-01-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 28, 2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | introduced in House |