KY HCR36 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Autonomous Vehicle Task Force to study safety benefits and concerns, liability and insurance issues, and economic impact; set task force membership; allow the task force to meet during the 2024 Interim and to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2024.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Autonomous Vehicle Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-01-25 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Legislative Research Commission
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Transportation
Legislative Research Commission
Motor Carriers
Motor Vehicles
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Transportation