KY HCR171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-3)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a concurrent resolution to require the United States Environmental Protection Agency to appear before a congressional committee before a rule or regulation is approved and call this resolution the "Coal Job Savings Resolution."
Title
Create a concurrent resolution to require the United States Environmental Protection Agency to appear before a congressional committee before a rule or regulation is approved and call this resolution the "Coal Job Savings Resolution."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-25 | House | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HC171.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HC171/bill.doc |