KY HCR104 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish the Workforce Growth and Solutions Task Force to study challenges related to workforce participation in the Commonwealth; provide recommendations on how to identify solutions to support workforce growth; require the task force to meet at least three times before the submission of its findings and recommendations; require the task force to submit its findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2024; provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified by the recommendations to the appropriate committee or subcommittee.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION directing the Legislative Research Commission to establish a Workforce Growth and Solutions Task Force to study worker participation in the Commonwealth and identify solutions to support workforce growth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Economic Development
Labor and Industry
Legislative Research Commission
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Workforce
Labor and Industry
Legislative Research Commission
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Workforce
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/24RS/hcr104.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/24RS/hcr104/orig_bill.pdf |