KY HCR101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a twelve-member Alcoholic Beverage Issues Subcommittee of the Interim Joint Committee on Licensing, Occupations, and Administrative Regulations to study the structure, intent, and effect of Kentucky alcoholic beverage laws; direct the subcommittee to meet on the same days as the interim joint committee; require the subcommittee to submit a memorandum containing its recommendations by December 1, 2017.
Title
Create a twelve-member Alcoholic Beverage Issues Subcommittee of the Interim Joint Committee on Licensing, Occupations, and Administrative Regulations to study the structure, intent, and effect of Kentucky alcoholic beverage laws; direct the subcommittee to meet on the same days as the interim joint committee; require the subcommittee to submit a memorandum containing its recommendations by December 1, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 53-27 |
2017-03-03 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HCR101.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HC101/bill.pdf |