KY HB89 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 446.010 to define "American Indian" to mean a person having origins in any of the original peoples of North and South America and who maintains tribal affiliation or community attachment to the tribe of origin; make conforming amendments.
Title
AN ACT relating to the definition of "American Indian."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-22 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-21 | 3rd reading, passed 60-34 | |
2010-01-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 19, 2010 | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB89.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB89/bill.doc |