KY HB87 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 199.572 to permit the child, grandchild, or sibling of a deceased birth parent or deceased adoptee to be given the right to inspect adoption papers and records.
Title
AN ACT relating to adoption records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 386 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3020 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 44 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3020 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 44 (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | passed 90-1 |
2024-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-22 | House | received in House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2024-01-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-01-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-12 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |