KY HB8 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.60-130 to extend the date for reimbursements of corrective action projects using moneys in the petroleum storage tank account; amend KRS 224.60-142 to extend the date of registration for owners of petroleum storage tanks containing motor fuels in order to be eligible to participate in the fund; extend the date allowing owners and operators to submit affidavits and applications through July 15, 2031, relevant to current petroleum storage tank accounts; amend KRS 224.60-145 to extend the small operator assistance and small operator tank removal accounts to July 15, 2031; amend KRS 224.50-868 to extend the fee currently imposed for each new motor vehicle, trailer, or semitrailer tire sold in Kentucky to July 1, 2026.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal matters, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Steven Rudy [R] | Rep. Josh Bray [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 418 (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr1 RSN# 3189 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3042 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 298 (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr1 RSN# 3189 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3042 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 298 (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2024-04-12 | Senate | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2024-04-12 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2024-04-12 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2024-04-12 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | received in House |
2024-04-10 | House | became law on April 10, 2024, without Governor's Signature |
2024-04-09 | House | 2 line items vetoed |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | passed 87-9 with Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2024-03-28 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | passed 34-0 with Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | received in House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2024-03-25 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-11 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-05 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-04 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-03-01 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Environment and Conservation
Fees
Fiscal Note
Fuel
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Budget and Financial Administration
Environment and Conservation
Fees
Fiscal Note
Fuel
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles