KY HB719 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 376.010 to establish a mechanism for protection for owners of leased property from liens arising from work performed through a contract with the lessee when the lessee is prohibited from entering into such an agreement by the lease; require the filing of notice documents with the county clerk to apprise the prospective provider of labor or materials; amend KRS 371.325 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to mechanic's and materialman's liens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 371 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2022-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-15 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |