KY HB708 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 205 to direct the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish a basic health program and to develop a benefits cliff calculator; direct the cabinet to establish and operate a Community Jobs Initiative pilot program; require the cabinet to seek federal approval if they determine that such approval is necessary; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the public assistance benefits cliff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2330 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 331 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 331 (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 174) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-24 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | reassigned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Economic Development
Effective Dates, Emergency
Federal Laws and Regulations
Insurance, Health
Poverty
Public Assistance
Public Medical Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Wages and Hours
Appropriations
Economic Development
Effective Dates, Emergency
Federal Laws and Regulations
Insurance, Health
Poverty
Public Assistance
Public Medical Assistance
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Wages and Hours