KY HB67 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Propose to create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky to state that Kentucky's Constitution does not secure or protect a right to abortion or funding of abortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing an amendment to the Constitution of Kentucky relating to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 209 (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-03-11Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-10House3rd reading, passed 71-21
2020-02-28Housefloor amendments (1-title), (2-title), (3), (4) and (5) filed
2020-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020
2020-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-10-04HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback