KY HB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to establish a refundable income tax credit for the costs of mitigating noise from a commercial airport for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, but before January 1, 2021; amend KRS 131.190 to require certain information to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission; amend various chapters in the Kentucky Revised Statutes to make conforming changes; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the credit.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax credits for airport noise mitigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-10-27 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB64.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB64/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/17RS/HB64/FN.pdf |