KY HB61 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-16 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 439.3401 to make criminal attempt to commit murder of a peace officer or a firefighter an offense for which at least 85 percent of the sentence must be served before probation or parole.
Title
AN ACT relating to criminal attempted murder.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Watkins [D] | Rep. Larry Brown [R] | Rep. Donna Mayfield [R] | Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Rep. Wesley Morgan [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-01-11 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-04 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
2017-11-17 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |