KY HB604 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require each school to employ at least one mental health professional for every 1,500 students; require the department of education of make available a toolkit to assist school districts in developing a trauma-informed approach in their schools; define "mental health professional" and "trauma-informed approach"; require each local board of education to develop a plan for implementing a trauma-informed approach in its schools by the 2020-2021 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to developing trauma-informed schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 325 (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21Senateto Education (S)
2018-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-16House3rd reading, passed 81-1 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-15Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed to Bill
2018-03-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2018
2018-03-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-03-12Houseposted in committee
2018-03-12Houseposting waived
2018-03-12Housereassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-03-01Houseto Education (H)
2018-02-27Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback