KY HB587 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section in KRS Chapter 65 to define terms and require a minimum investment be pledged from private sector investors, consolidated local government, and the Commonwealth; require incremental tax revenues be pledged to the West End Opportunity Partnership from a consolidated local government and the Commonwealth; effective only if 2021 Regular Session Bill Request Number 1553 becomes law; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the West End Opportunity Partnership and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Fleming [R] | Rep. Pamela Stevenson [D] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Bobby McCool [R] |
Rep. David Osborne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-15 | House | 2nd reading |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st reading |
2021-03-11 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-24 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Consolidated Local Governments
Fiscal Note
Local Mandate
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Individual
Taxation, Property
Taxation, Sales and Use
Consolidated Local Governments
Fiscal Note
Local Mandate
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Individual
Taxation, Property
Taxation, Sales and Use