KY HB585 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 111)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 65.750 to 65.760 to declare legislative findings relating to the provision of 911 emergency services; amend KRS 65.750 to change the definitions for "911 emergency service," "automatic number identification," and "automatic location identification"; add definitions for "automatic call distribution," "automatic vehicle location," "FCC order," "geographic information systems," "Law Enforcement Information Network of Kentucky and the National Crime Information Center," "local government," "master street address guide," "service connection," and "Interconnected Voice over Internet Protocol"; amend KRS 65.760 to require VoIP providers to collect locally-imposed 911 fees; list all allowable uses of locally-imposed 911 fees, list prohibited uses of locally imposed 911 fees; amend KRS 65.7621 to change definitions for "administrator," "automatic location identification," "automatic number identification," and "board,"; add definitions for "next generation 911," "prepaid wireless communications service," "prepaid wireless telecommunications service provider," and "service connection"; amend KRS 65.7623 to change the name of the Commercial Mobile Radio Service Emergency Telecommunications Board of Kentucky to the Kentucky 911 Services Board; remove the administrator and the member who is a mayor of a city or urban-county government from membership of the board; add two members serving as city officials, two members serving as county officials, two nonvoting legislative members, and the executive director of the Office of Homeland Security to the membership of the board; require the board to hold at least four meetings per year, two of which must be in congressional districts other than the one in which Frankfort is located; amend KRS 65.7625 to include in the administrator's duties the development and implementation of next generation 911 service; require the administrator to report to the board at each meeting regarding his or her activities since the last meeting; amend KRS 65.7627 to provide that revenues from the wireless service charge shall be generated equitably from prepaid and postpaid connections; provide that the postpaid wireless service charge be deposited into the CMRS fund; amend KRS 65.7629 to require the postpaid service charge to be adjusted once every four years according the positive percentage change in the CPI-U unless otherwise directed by the General Assembly; require the change to be accomplished by the promulgation of an administrative regulation to take effect on July 1 of the relevant year; require notice of the adjustment be given to affected providers by April 1 of the relevant year; require the board to deposit revenues from the wireless service charge into the CMRS fund; require the auditor retained by the board to verify the accuracy of CMRS customer count information; require the auditor retained by the board to share information with the Legislative Research Commission and the Auditor of Public Accounts; amend KRS 65.7630 to require the board to issue a report on data and information regarding 911 funding and the collection of service charges by November 1 of each year; specify reporting requirements for local government agencies with one or more PSAPs; require CMRS providers to submit quarterly reports to the board of their customer counts; amend KRS 65.7631 to adjust the apportionment formula for disbursement of moneys from the CMRS fund; end cost recovery disbursements for CMRS providers for compliance with wireless E911 service requirements; amend KRS 65.7633 to conform; amend KRS 65.7635 to require postpaid wireless service charges to be remitted by providers within 30 days of the end of the calendar month in which they were collected instead of within 60 days; amend KRS 65.7641 to increase the value of wrongfully obtained wireless emergency telephone service from $100 to $500 before it may be prosecuted as a Class D felony; amend KRS 39G.040, 65.755, 278.541, and 278.542 to conform; provide for the staggering of the Governor's appointments for the new members to the Kentucky 911 Services Board.
Title
AN ACT relating to 911 emergency services and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Thomas McKee [D] |
Rep. Marie Rader [R] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 111) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-5 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-25 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-25 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-22 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day Tuesday, March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-21 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-21 | House | 2nd reading |
2016-03-21 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-18 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-18 | House | 1st reading |
2016-03-18 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-02 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | introduced in House |