KY HB57 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311A.030 to remove the classifications of ambulance services, mobile integrated healthcare programs, and medical first response providers; amend KRS 311A.142 to permit an emergency medical responder, emergency medical technician, advanced emergency medical technician, or paramedic in good standing in another state to be eligible for reciprocity at the same level of certification or licensure; amend KRS 142.301, 205.5602, 211.9523, 311A.010, 311A.170, and 405.075 to conform; repeal KRS 311A.185, relating to determination of death by a paramedic; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to emergency medical services and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Freeland [R] | Rep. Ken Fleming [R] | Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Marianne Proctor [R] |
Rep. Walker Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3123 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 88 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 88 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2024-03-06 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 07, 2024 |
2024-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-25 | House | reassigned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Boards and Commissions
Effective Dates, Emergency
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Occupations and Professions
Boards and Commissions
Effective Dates, Emergency
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Licensing
Occupations and Professions