KY HB57 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - passed 49-38
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - passed 49-38
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.078 relating to expungement of misdemeanor and violation arrest records to clarify that a traffic infraction does not disqualify a person from seeking such an expungement.
Title
AN ACT relating to non-felony expungements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | passed 49-38 |
2013-03-26 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) |
2013-03-26 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) |
2013-03-26 | House | received in House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-10 with committee amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 11, 2013 |
2013-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-05 | House | posting waived |
2013-01-08 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |