KY HB569 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to establish an automatic expungement process for specific eligible misdemeanor and felony convictions; allow the Commonwealth's and county attorney to object and halt the automatic expungement of certain offenses; amend KRS 431.074 to require the Administrative Office of the Courts to establish a searchable portal to allow a person to determine if his or her conviction has been expunged; amend KRS 27A.300 to provide that the centralized criminal history record information system administered pursuant to KRS 27A.310 to 27A.440 is the official record of criminal proceedings; create new section of KRS Chapter 411 to create a cause of action against criminal history providers who do not comply with an expungement order; provide that the Act may be cited as the Clean State Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to criminal history.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-12Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2024-03-12House2nd reading
2024-03-12Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2024-03-11Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2024-03-11House1st reading
2024-03-11Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2024-02-27Houseto Judiciary (H)
2024-02-15Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2024-02-15Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback