KY HB562 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal, reenact, and amend KRS Sections 315.510 to 315.524 as a new sections of KRS Chapter 194A to remove home medical equipment and service providers from the authority of the Kentucky Board of Pharmacy and place under the authority of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; create new sections of KRS Chapter 194A to establish conditions under which the cabinet may suspend, revoke, or deny a license or impose sanctions on a licensee, and to authorize the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations, investigate complaints or violations, issue subpoenas and conduct hearings, and assess fees; amend KRS 315.121, 315,191, and 304.17A-005 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to home medical equipment service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 103) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | passed 93-0 |
2016-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-3 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-25 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2016-03-15 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2016-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-02 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | introduced in House |