KY HB553 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - became law without Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - became law without Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to define terms; establish the Kentucky Rural Veterinary Medicine Student Loan Repayment Program for an eligible livestock practitioner who engages in veterinary medicine in an underserved rural area or veterinary shortage area for five consecutive years; authorize the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to promulgate administrative regulations; set forth program eligibility requirements; authorize the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to award loan repayment benefits to applicants selected by the Veterinary Student Loan Repayment Selection Committee; establish compliance requirements; create the rural veterinary care trust fund; establish purposes of the fund; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky rural veterinary student loan repayment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 290 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 290 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | became law without Governor's Signature |
2024-04-09 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-22 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-4 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-21 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Agriculture
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Appropriations
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Fiscal Note
State Agencies
Veterinarians
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Agriculture
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Appropriations
Education, Finance
Education, Higher
Fiscal Note
State Agencies
Veterinarians