KY HB525 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 106)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 247.233 relating to emergency medical transport where an injury is a result of a failure of an amusement ride or attraction.
Title
AN ACT relating to amusement rides.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Butler [R] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] |
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 106) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | Bill passed 100-0 |
2015-03-24 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-2 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | recommitted to Agriculture (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-02-27 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-26 | House | returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-25 | House | returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |