KY HB51 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 193 to expand, to the extent feasible, the Department of Corrections’ current Farm Operations Program to all adult correctional facilities operated within the Commonwealth, including correctional facilities operated by private contractors; include definitions for "agriculture," "agricultural commodity," "apiary", "aquaculture," "food bank," livestock," and "poultry"; restrict the consumption of food and agricultural products grown or produced under the Farm Operations Program to inmates and other enumerated individuals or organizations; require that any surplus of agricultural commodities be donated; exempt certain livestock production, use, and ; authorize the department to create an outreach program to facilitate the development of farm operations programs for county jails; require the department to promulgate administrative regulations in accordance with KRS Chapter 13A to develop a strategic plan for the implementation of the goals, objectives, and program criteria of the Farm Operations Program; identify land and property suitable for development; require the department to submit an annual report to the Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary by November 1, beginning in 2017 and provide information on the status of the program, including progress made in achieving the program’s purposes, expenditures, and cost savings attributed to the program, and any other information the department can provide concerning the program’s operations.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Department of Corrections' farm operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-25 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-12-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |