KY HB51 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-26 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 61.870 to 61.884 to prohibit a person from using a booking photograph for a commercial purpose if that photograph will be posted in a publication or on a Web site, and the removal of the booking photograph requires the payment of a fee or other consideration; amend KRS 61.870 to define "booking photograph"; amend KRS 61.8745 to include the misuse of booking photographs as a violation.
Title
AN ACT relating to booking photographs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 55-45 with committee amendment (1) |
2014-02-18 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-18 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2014-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |