KY HB502 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to regulate the collection, use, and disclosure of genetic data; create a civil cause of action for violations of the prohibitions, to be brought by the Attorney General; state that the Act shall be known as the Genetic Information Privacy Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to genetic information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2306 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 276 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 275 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 276 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 275 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 169) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-16 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (2) and (3) |
2022-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2022-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-08 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Health and Medical Services
Public Ethics
Public Health
Short Titles and Popular Names
Civil Actions
Health and Medical Services
Public Ethics
Public Health
Short Titles and Popular Names