KY HB502 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new section of KRS 224.43 to define "public agency"; amend KRS 224.43-610 to prohibit a public agency from mandating use of compact fluorescent light bulbs to promote energy savings absent a method of safe disposal; require the method be disclosed in the solid waste management plan where the waste is generated and disposed of; amend 224.43-710 to make assistance to cities, counties, and waste management districts for determining a method of safe disposal of compact fluorescent light bulbs; amend 224.43-730 to allow applicants of solid waste management studies to include studies of proper disposal of compact fluorescent light bulbs.
Title
AN ACT relating to the environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-24 | returned to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-24 | taken from the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-23 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2010-03-23 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-18 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-15 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-26 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2010-02-24 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB502.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB502/bill.doc |