KY HB500 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 241.010 to define "barrel-aged and batched cocktails," "private selection event," and "private selection package" and to redefine "consumer" and "vintage distilled spirit"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to establish a "limited nonquota package license" that allows designated alcoholic beverage drink licensees to sell vintage distilled spirits and private selection packages; amend KRS 243.027 to authorize a manufacturer to ship samples to persons or entities engaged in private selection events; indicate that the shipped sample quantity limits apply to each separate recipient; amend KRS 243.029 to require a direct shipper licensee to include all applicable taxes in the selling price for alcoholic beverages; include sales tax as a separate item on the customer's invoice; amend KRS 243.030 to set a $300 annual fee for a limited nonquota package license and for an off-premises retail sales outlet license; amend KRS 243.0305 to allow a distiller to conduct private selection events and sell private selection packages at retail; set package and sample limits for sales at fairs, festivals, and other similar types of events; permit distillers to purchase jointly branded souvenir packages from microbreweries; restrict a distiller to only one off-premises retail site for each of its licensed premises; amend KRS 243.110 to make a limited nonquota package license compatible with listed drink licenses; amend KRS 243.232 to authorize a limited nonquota package license holder to sell vintage distilled spirits; amend KRS 243.240 to exclude private selection package sales from the normal quota retail package license restrictions; amend KRS 243.260 to issue a special temporary license for farmers markets; amend KRS 243.884 to exempt most private selection package sales from the wholesale tax; amend KRS 244.240 to exclude a distiller selling private selection packages or supplying barrels for barred-aged and batched cocktails from the interlocking interests prohibition; amend KRS 244.260 to permit a retailer to keep distilled spirits or wine in a container for preparing barred-aged and batched cocktails; align distilled spirit container limits with the largest applicable federal standard of fill size; amend KRS 243.034 and 243.0341 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2190 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 263 (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 263 (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 39) |
2022-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-24 | House | received in House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 25-11-1 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-21 | Senate | returned to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | taken from Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-17 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2), and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-10 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-02 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Distilled Spirits
Fees
Licensing
Malt Beverages
Trade Practices and Retailing
Wines and Wineries
Distilled Spirits
Fees
Licensing
Malt Beverages
Trade Practices and Retailing
Wines and Wineries